Trustees Cornerstone Methodist Church
Charity number: 1134052

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GAVIN PATRICK HANCOCKS BTH | Chair | 01 October 2016 |
|
|||||
John Douglas Williams | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Denise Sillett | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Randell | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELAINE DANIELL | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Dale | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ernest Rodney Shaw | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Teresa Helen Thomson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
John Neville Dale BA Hons | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
PETER STANLEY BRAMHILL | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Randell | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Grace Tunbridge | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET LAWLEY BEdHons MA | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Deacon SARAH JANE PITKEATHLY | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|||||
David Patrick Gilbert | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frederick William King | Trustee | 28 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.