MIDDLESBROUGH & ESTON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We employ staff & provide support to the local Methodist Churches for people to meet together for worship & teaching. We encourage & support the Churches in their mission to serve their local communities; e.g youth clubs, luncheon clubs, toddlers groups. We manage projects with specific vulnerable groups within our communities - young people, children & families, refugees & people seeking asylum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

39 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 01 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
39 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Christopher Lyness | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Anthony Marsh | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tat Cheong Luk | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Charles Howard-Norman | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Mapplebeck | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chibuike Ukeje-Eloaga | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Andrew Godfrey | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Jillian Margaret Lambert | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carole Margaret Roberts | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Harris | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Charity Kathleen McKenzie Hamilton | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Glenys Wildon | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE MAY SCURRAH | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pat Hinton | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD NIXON MCIAT | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MARTIN | Trustee | 19 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA BROWN | Trustee | 06 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIE HEATHER THOMAS | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN ROSEMARY MEALING | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HINTON | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|||||
Mark Richard Braithwaite | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIE DOROTHY ELIZABETH O'KEY | Trustee | 14 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH BONE | Trustee | 21 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET RUTH TAYLOR | Trustee | 21 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ELLIOTT | Trustee | 21 September 2011 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA JEAN BARRETT | Trustee | 12 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
RUTH LEWIS | Trustee | 28 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
KEITH MARTIN JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLAIRE SANDERSON TATE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON-KAY KUEN LOVERIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANN MILBURN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA AUDREY CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID STANLEY BYE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV LEONARD KARN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA MARGARET MARTIN | Trustee |
|
||||||
Brian James Glover | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dawn Elizabeth Harris | Trustee |
|
||||||
Lesley Anne Duffield | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAY ANNE BRAITHWAITE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.05k | £458.13k | £146.47k | £150.23k | £162.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.71k | £160.30k | £247.95k | £225.67k | £129.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NUNTHORPE METHODIST CHURCH
CONNAUGHT ROAD
NUNTHORPE
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS7 0BP
- Phone:
- 01642323924
- Email:
- mbrocircuit@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window