GRACIOUS STREET METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE COMMUNITY OPPORTUNITIES IN A CARING CHRISTIAN ENVIRONMENT. WORSHIP FOR ALL AGES AND STYLES EACH SUNDAY. COFFEE BAR AND CHANGING PLACE FACILITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

30 Trustee(s)
125 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 02 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GORDON HAY | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN SHANKSTER | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MORAG ROSS | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE BULLOCK | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEACON ROSEMARY COGGRAVE | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY PEARSON | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS RODNEY MOXLEY | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nick Garrett | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||
MIKE HUGHES | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANNE THICKETT | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Liz Rochester | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN COOK | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ben Clowes | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
VICKIE WRIGGLESWORTH | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
HILARY ETHEL WILKINSON | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev PETER WHITTAKER BA | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN WHITTAKER | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
LIBBY COOKE | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michael Victor Borkett | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY WEBSTER | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WALKINGTON | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
VICKIE TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WHALLEY | Trustee | 12 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEANETTE MOWAT | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ROCHESTER | Trustee | 02 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Graham Taylor | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|||||
ALAN MIDDLETON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BILL RODHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RACHEL WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELEANOR BORKETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.09k | £243.85k | £211.82k | £211.82k | £220.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.68k | £217.19k | £189.73k | £189.73k | £250.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 October 2020 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 October 2020 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gracious Street Methodist Church
Chapel Street
KNARESBOROUGH
HG5 8AN
- Phone:
- 01423860166
- Email:
- knmethodist@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window