THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ALKMUNDS DUFFIELD

Charity number: 1134125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Church ministers to Duffield and the surrounding area with teaching on Christian faith to people of all ages. We provide services of baptism, thanksgiving, marriage and funerals together with pastoral care associated with these and other events and also regular corporate worship. Co-operating with local churches we help the Homeless and with other organisations we work for World Mission.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £251,944
Total expenditure: £250,619

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • DUFFIELD PARISH CHURCH PCC. (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev James Thomas Hughes Chair 06 September 2016
FELLOWSHIP OF WORD AND SPIRIT
Received: On time
THE DUFFIELD GIRLS' AND INFANTS' RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FUND
Received: On time
EDWARD POTTERELL'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
CHURCH SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE DUFFIELD ENDOWED SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE LATIMER TRUST
Received: On time
THE BATES TRUST
Received: On time
Jodi Margaret Gray Mrs Trustee 26 April 2023
THE DUFFIELD GIRLS' AND INFANTS' RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FUND
Received: On time
Emma Rollin Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Dr Christine Fraser-Moodie Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Elaine Parkin Trustee 18 May 2022
None on record
Gillian Elisabeth Linford Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
Janet Elizabeth Roulstone Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
Dr Roger David White Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
Thomas Reith Gray Trustee 10 April 2019
None on record
Anna Mary Maddison Trustee 10 April 2019
JOSEPH WEBSTER'S CHARITY
Received: On time
NICK PEACOCK Trustee 05 December 2012
THE DUFFIELD ENDOWED SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Paul Alastair Linford Trustee 05 December 2012
THE DUFFIELD GIRLS' AND INFANTS' RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FUND
Received: On time
Marion Elizabeth TAULBUT Trustee
THE DUFFIELD ENDOWED SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JOSEPH WEBSTER'S CHARITY
Received: On time
DUFFIELD AND LITTLE EATON TRUST FOR GOSPEL MINISTRY
Received: On time
MELINDA JANE PEACOCK Trustee
None on record
RICHARD LINDOP Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £214.09k £240.78k £210.68k £209.62k £251.94k
Total expenditure £222.02k £218.53k £205.46k £239.15k £250.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.28k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 November 2022 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St Alkmund's Church
Church Drive
Duffield
DE56 4BA
Phone:
01332840677