PRESTON RIBBLE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Preston Ribble Circuit enabled worship across thirteen places of worship with six ordained Ministers, four lay workers and twenty eight lay preachers. In addition significant social care was exercised through programmes by the churches. The Circuit supports the churches in their mission, ministry and worship. The Circuit now follows our "Following Jesus Loving Communities" policy document.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£772,774
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £683.70k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £28.29k | |
Other | £60.79k |
Total expenditure:
£626,358
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £626.36k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £626.36k | |
Retained for future use | £146.42k |
People

8 Employee(s)
70 Trustee(s)
765 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 17 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PRESTON METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
70 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Squire | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Barbara Ashcroft | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Lynne Moorhouse | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rachael Abram | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Julia Robinson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Wendy Yates | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Veronica Frost | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Ken Wales | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Michael Grimsley | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Skidmore | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Morgan | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Harry Duckett | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
John Jefferson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Edward Sidgreaves | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Suzanne Stewart | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rhona Goulden | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Carolyn Hothersall | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Mears | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Wendy Bennett | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Darren Arnold | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Karen Le Mouton | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah O'Halloran | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev John Maiden | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Barbara Pettitt | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dorothy Crane | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Desley Jefferson | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Blackett | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Denise Johnson | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Ruth Millward-Hopkins | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Marion Hancock | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
John Leigh | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Davina Hinchliffe | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Jane Wild | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Judith Gallagher | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Ron Bosworth | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Bourne | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Oldfield | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Mike Ellis | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
John Cocker | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Sandra Atkins | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Ainsworth | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Gillian Ferris | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|||||||
David Lowes | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Warnock | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|||||||
Gill Mason | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|||||||
John Atkins | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|||||||
Graham Turner | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MELVINA WATSON | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||
ELIZABETH ANN LEIGH | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Anthony William Andrews | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|||||||
GEOFFREY WHALLEY | Trustee | 22 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERT MATTHEWS | Trustee | 22 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||
SUE DAVIES | Trustee | 02 June 2011 |
|
|
||||||
DR CAROL SPENCER B.A., M.A., PH.D., | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANNE MARGARET WHALLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JENNY BERRILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN NORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
HENRY DAVID ROSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MICHAEL SIDGREAVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Peter David Taylor | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JOHN ELLIOTT FERRIS MICSA | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JOHN DUNCAN SPENCER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
LESLEY ANNE BIRKETT | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DAVID GRAHAM EVANS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JENNIFER TILLOTSON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Zoe Elizabeth Ainsworth | Trustee |
|
||||||||
STEPHEN WILLIAM GREGORY B.SC. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CAROLE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER SAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LYNNE LESLEY WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £459.76k | £438.08k | £462.62k | £720.71k | £772.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £582.05k | £568.83k | £645.72k | £640.44k | £626.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.51k | £19.90k | £331 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £656.67k | £683.70k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.33k | £28.29k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £60.71k | £60.79k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £640.44k | £626.36k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.41k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.49m | £1.54m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £50.58k | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £984.23k | £1.21m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £56.84k | £133.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRESTON RIBBLE CIRCUIT OFFICE
1 WATLING STREET ROAD
FULWOOD
PRESTON
PR2 8EA
- Phone:
- 01772713743
- Email:
- pr_adm1n@outlook.com
- Website:
-
prestonribblemethodistcircuit.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window