ANSON CABIN PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anson Cabin Project provides activities for the benefit of people living on the Anson Estate in Longsight Manchester. This activities include Playgroup under 5's after school clubs, 5 years - 13years, Youth Activities 13yrs - 19years - we also provide Holiday playscheme activities during school holidays. We also work with adults on the estate to provide parenting classes, numeracy and language.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £62,871 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 11 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAMANTHA MINSHULL | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
CAROLINE McKEAGUE | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||
TONY O'MAHONY | Trustee | 31 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||
PATRICIA COLEMAN | Trustee | 31 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||
PAULA GRIFFIN | Trustee | 31 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN BYRNE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.18k | £127.13k | £120.79k | £136.61k | £142.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.81k | £105.38k | £110.05k | £119.77k | £131.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £14.89k | £16.93k | £20.17k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £119.78k | £112.23k | £102.52k | £58.04k | £62.87k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ANSON ESTATE AREA OF MANCHESTER BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
ANSON ESTATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATI
38 MELDON ROAD
MANCHESTER
M13 0TR
- Phone:
- 01612485695
- Email:
- info@ansoncabin.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window