Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, FAREHAM

Charity number: 1135129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £227.88k £193.90k £214.08k £231.08k £248.44k
Total expenditure £252.76k £206.38k £213.97k £231.59k £432.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £35.93k N/A N/A N/A N/A