Trustees UNITED METHODIST CHURCH CLIFTON
Charity Number: 1134969

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Louise Makin | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Colclough | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ivor Anthony Jordan | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Kendrick | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Mary Jordan | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Francis Lovell | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Roy Bott | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Williams | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Bagnall | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Bott | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Safhill | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Timmiss | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Dunn | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Margaret Moran | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Cheetham | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bagnall | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
LUCY OLIVIA ARNO | Trustee | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN LAURA JORDAN | Trustee | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JORDAN ALEXANDER ARNO | Trustee | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAT RAISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JENIFER LOVELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN RAISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH ANN OLLIVANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN KEITH HANNAM CQSW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JIM STEEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET MORAN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.