THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DUKINFIELD ST JOHN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all; provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation; pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved; teaching of Christianity; taking of religious assemblies in schools; promotion of the whole mission of the Church through activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other groups; supporting other charities in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

20 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Tameside
Governance
- 02 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN'S PCC, DUKINFIELD (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Hayes | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Vanessa Zanft | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Denise Michele Connolly | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Patricia Burgess | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Isaac Grant Morrison | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Broadbent | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Gerard Leigh | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Metcalfe | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helena Marie Hill | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Dewsnap Clarke | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Knight | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Erica Splawnyk | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Devlin | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
OSYP SPLAWNYK | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETE DEVLIN | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Ben Hayes | Trustee | 13 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
LUCY MARY LEECH | Trustee | 14 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN LEECH | Trustee | 14 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARGARET BRADSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY CLIFFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.85k | £137.73k | £155.29k | £151.78k | £151.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.50k | £142.05k | £123.16k | £170.76k | £166.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Church
Vicarage Drive
DUKINFIELD
SK16 5HZ
- Phone:
- 01613388199
- Email:
- office@stjohnsdukinfield.com
- Website:
-
stjohnsdukinfield.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window