LINACRE METHODIST MISSION AND NEIGHBOURHOOD CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To carry out religious activities. To provide premises for use by a wide range of community groups and activities. To carry out youth work, uniformed and non-uniformed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sefton
Governance
- 05 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- LINACRE MISSION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ian Joseph Kaili Hu | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dot Dickson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Neil Stubbens | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Nigel Harrison | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Bell | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LANGTON | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELAINE LANGTON | Trustee | 29 July 2012 |
|
|||||
MARGARET EDNA WHEELER | Trustee | 29 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE IRIS COUSINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN BARNES | Trustee |
|
||||||
VALERIE ANNE GEE | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOAN CUMMING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIVIENNE MARRIOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS LIZ SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.31k | £819.49k | £438.15k | £66.62k | £178.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.28k | £816.19k | £444.47k | £57.84k | £95.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £798.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £20.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £465 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £365 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £2.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £53.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £763.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1939), METHODIST CHURCH FUNDS ACT (1960) AND DEED OF UNION (1932)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Linacre Methodist Mission
Linacre Road
Litherland
Liverpool
L21 8NS
- Phone:
- 01519331707
- Email:
- linacremission@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window