MILKY WAY (UK) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees currently have a policy of supporting projects which further the education relation needs of dis-advantaged young people in India (but not limited to India).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
Governance
- 17 June 2010: Standard registration
- 19 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1086173 STRONGBONES CHILDREN'S CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KUSHAL KUMAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
AKSHAY SHAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REMI WILLIAM JACQUES BOURRETTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEETIKA RAI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PRIYA KUMAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ISABELLE MARIE ELEONORE BOURRETTE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34 | £25 | £1 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £5.00k | £11.74k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 August 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS"), IN BUT NOT LIMITED TO, INDIA: 1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, BY PROVIDING FINANCE, SUPPORT AND/OR INFRASTRUCTURE DEVELOPMENT FOR EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS; 2. TO OTHERWISE ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED OR IN NEED; 3. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND NEED IN PARTICULAR FOR SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED ADULTS AND CHILDREN; AND 4. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING WITH THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL SERVICES.
Area of benefit
INDIA:
Contact information
- Address:
-
26A ROLAND WAY
LONDON
SW7 3RE
- Phone:
- 07764655397
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window