EVESHAM METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide acts of worship for members of the church and non-members. Provide a sacred space (building) for prayer & contemplation. Teach Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Perform pastoral work (visiting the sick and the bereaved). Provide a toddlers group, sunday school and womens group with a Christian ethos. Support other charities in the UK & overseas with money & prayer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

23 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 13 April 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Katherine Jill Pickering | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rev Elizabeth Mary Harris | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Margaret Saunders | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
Joanna Davis | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Brenda Morton | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Kathleen Wadams | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Hardstaffe | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dirk Doorduyn | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rachel Sarah Care | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
JEAN PRITCHARD | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
MRS PAULINE GEARY | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET VOYIAGIS | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||
VIV JONES | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
SHEILA WEARY | Trustee | 26 November 2013 |
|
|||||||
REV DAVID ARTHER HASLAM | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ERIC GEORGE HENRY JONES | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||
SHEILA JOYCE HIMSWORTH | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|||||||
MRS ROS KANE | Trustee | 28 August 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Anne Fuller | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DIANE CAPEL | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JOYCE ANN DAVEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LINDA RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANDREW CHARLES PHILIP CAPEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.98k | £77.45k | £83.03k | £83.49k | £80.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.32k | £117.65k | £84.28k | £86.91k | £92.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2024
(These accounts |
10 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2022
(These accounts |
16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2021
(These accounts |
09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Evesham Methodist Church
71 Bridge Street
EVESHAM
WR11 4SF
- Phone:
- 01386442380
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window