Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST PETER, BURY ST EDMUNDS

Charity number: 1134666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £293.76k £282.62k £298.17k £340.16k £405.03k
Total expenditure £350.57k £318.59k £343.53k £418.35k £384.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £26.18k £9.87k £1.90k £1.00k £1.00k