Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESISASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT PAUL, MONK BRETTON

Charity number: 1138521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Father Darren James Percival Chair 25 January 2023
BARNSLEY FOOD BANK PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Ayshea Ann Pressley Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Michelle Heather Logan Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Mary Bullock Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Father Joseph Harrison O.C.R. Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Christopher Shinn Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Gavin Logan Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Wendy Theresa Tompson Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
ADRIAN ENGLAND Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
Janet Elizabeth Richards Trustee 08 May 2021
None on record
Arlene Lorraine Francis Trustee 04 October 2020
None on record
SHIRLEY MARGARET RAWSON Trustee 19 April 2019
None on record
LYNDA ELIZABETH BROWN Trustee
None on record
DAPHNE ANN WOFFINDEN Trustee
None on record