Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN AND ST WULSTAN, SELLY PARK, BIRMINGHAM

Charity number: 1135051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev CHRISTOPHER BEDO HOBBS Chair
None on record
Susan Janice Fearon Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
Hannah Cawthorn Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
Julie Richards Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
Ian Timothy Pearson Trustee 11 May 2025
None on record
Thomas Bryant Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Samuel Chow Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Cordelia Checketts Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
David Chen Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Lorraine Freeman Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Paul Coley Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Eldric Li Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Ruth McNeill Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Richard Phillips Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Charles Nicholas Devas Trustee 26 April 2023
GLOBAL AID NETWORK UK
Received: On time
Paula Richardson Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Dr Christopher Barry Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Rev Ben Wells Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record