Financial history CHARITYWORKS

Charity Number: 1136964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £749.44k £711.18k £236.00k £744.66k £525.58k
Total expenditure £706.88k £724.34k £200.00k £720.09k £560.48k
Income from government contracts N/A £8.34k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £105.00k N/A £35.00k £94.02k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £749.44k £606.17k N/A £709.66k £431.56k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £706.88k £724.34k N/A £720.09k £560.48k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £28.03k N/A £18.13k £34.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 £23.75k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0