Trustees BASO-THE ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER SURGERY
Charity number: 1136067

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Ibrahim Sallam | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ms Gloria Petralia | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anastasios Kanatas | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pankaj Roy Gupta | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Tomlins | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Cunha | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Skaife | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Avi Agrawal | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anant Desai | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Aaron Quyn | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jayant Vaidya | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jim Khan | Trustee | 04 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor MICHAEL DOUEK FRCS | Trustee | 14 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.