WARWICKSHIRE COUNSELLING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer a confidential and professional counselling service for adults, children and young people from throughout Warwickshire but especially Nuneaton, Bedworth and the surrounding areas. We offer counselling in schools, childrens centres, and in our centre in Nuneaton. We offer training workshops in bereavement, anger awareness courses and an Introduction to Counselling Skills (ICSK-L2) course.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £35,189 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 26 August 2010: Standard registration
- SYCAMORE COUNSELLING SERVICE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith James Drinkwater | Chair | 25 July 2014 |
|
|||||||
Lorna Beedham | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
Emma Williams | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
John Bruce McKenzie | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £213.30k | £181.90k | £220.60k | £279.60k | £315.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.77k | £168.58k | £191.12k | £229.88k | £257.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.91k | £53.61k | £39.82k | £88.11k | £35.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 APRIL 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 18 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE MENTAL, EMOTIONAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN WARWICKSHIRE BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ON THE SUBJECT OF HOW TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH MENTAL, EMOTIONAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
WARWICKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 RIVERSLEY ROAD
NUNEATON
WARWICKSHIRE
CV11 5QT
- Phone:
- 02476744544
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window