Financial history SWANSEA UNIVERSITY

Charity Number: 1138342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £317.50m £360.67m £340.09m £412.63m £381.61m
Total expenditure £285.09m £332.92m £447.63m £348.69m £298.78m
Income from government contracts £21.60m £12.09m £15.91m £21.09m £16.03m
Income from government grants £1.82m £7.98m £323.58k £3.02m £6.62m
Income - Donations and legacies £245.00k £251.00k £432.00k £282.00k £839.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £316.63m £360.33m £368.81m £406.22m £373.56m
Income - Endowments £4.00k £88.00k £30.00k £9.00k £85.00k
Income - Investment £631.00k £87.00k £812.00k £6.12m £7.21m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £285.09m £332.92m £447.57m £348.62m £298.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £61.92k £72.41k £52.94k
Expenditure - Governance £83.00k £73.00k £136.00k £141.00k £158.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £1.33m £1.30m £1.22m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0