PRENTON METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE HOLD SERVICES ON SUNDAY MORNING AT 10.30. WE HAVE A BUGGY CLUB ON A MONDAY, LEGO CHURCH ONCE A MONTH ON A SATURDAY AND "MESSY CHURCH" ONCE DURING SCHOOL HOLIDAYS. WE HAVE A SUCCESSFUL CHILDREN'S SUMMER HOLIDAY CLUB. WE HOLD A FELLOWSHIP GROUP EVERY OTHER WEDNESDAY. OUR PREMISES ARE USED REGULARLY BY SCOUTS AND GUIDES . SEVERAL COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS ALSO USE THE CHURCH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wirral
Governance
- 04 August 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Yangsun Yi | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Corran | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Grisdale | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Vera May Williams | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATHY THOMAS | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||
JOHN DAVID GRIFFITH | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr Janet Almond | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr MARTIN EDWARD BLOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAUREEN ELSIE LAWSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID GEORGE CASEMENT | Trustee |
|
||||||
BARRY NATTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS NORMA CASEMENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAT GRIFFITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLENYS RUTH JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ALAN INGRAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.92k | £51.49k | £56.89k | £59.38k | £59.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.82k | £57.52k | £51.22k | £52.78k | £58.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Woodlands Drive
WIRRAL
Merseyside
CH61 1AL
- Phone:
- 07810002331
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window