Financial history ROYAL WELSH COLLEGE OF MUSIC AND DRAMA

Charity number: 1139282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £15.39m £15.25m £16.64m £19.21m £22.14m
Total expenditure £15.36m £16.14m £18.12m £20.28m £20.07m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.85m £1.05m £1.67m £3.98m £4.39m
Income - Other trading activities £361.00k £115.00k £473.00k £1.13m £1.51m
Income - Charitable activities £12.28m £12.98m £13.62m £14.67m £15.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £1.68m £33.00k
Income - Investment £141.00k £94.00k £65.00k £273.00k £446.00k
Income - Other £767.00k £1.01m £803.00k £836.00k £828.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £2.00m £120.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £15.12m £15.79m £17.84m £19.96m £19.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £234.96k £281.77k £279.00k £314.00k £358.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £34.00k £38.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £62.24k £0 £0 £0