Financial history THE BEWDLEY CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 501137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £7.13k £221 £4.43k £4.54k £7.03k
Total expenditure £4.23k £595 £5.29k £6.09k £7.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A