Financial history FIRST LOVE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1137819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £604.09k £977.27k £566.99k £876.29k £615.76k
Total expenditure £566.00k £647.62k £695.64k £749.10k £782.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £89.16k £71.62k £15.00k £12.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £387.86k £730.45k £482.32k £870.18k £601.61k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £216.20k £246.32k £84.62k £0 £12.50k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £31 £86 £46 £912 £1.65k
Income - Other £0 £414 £0 £5.20k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £566.00k £551.69k £583.48k £595.36k £782.48k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £95.93k £111.96k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £1.75k £6.71k £6.33k £1.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £549.94k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £201 £153.74k £0