THE UNIV. OLD MEMBERS' TRUST

Charity number: 1137545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To further the educational purposes of University College Oxford

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £466,006
Total expenditure: £329,779

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 August 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Hugh Gourley Marks Chair 22 March 2024
None on record
Dr Oliver Cox Trustee 22 March 2024
None on record
Andrew David Skipper Trustee 22 March 2024
None on record
Guy Duncan Cleland Paterson Trustee 22 March 2024
None on record
Shuchi Hinesh Shah Trustee 22 March 2024
None on record
Dr Ruth Norris Trustee 22 March 2024
None on record
Dr Andrew Graham Bell Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Khalid Siddique Trustee 01 October 2021
THE WELCOME CENTRE (HUDDERSFIELD)
Received: On time
Graeme Proudfoot Trustee 03 December 2018
THE INVESCO CARES FOUNDATION
Received: On time
AMICI CANTATE
Received: 4 days late
Amrita Hofmaier Trustee 03 December 2018
None on record
Dr Andrew Ian Grant Trustee 31 August 2017
THE MASTER AND FELLOWS OF THE COLLEGE OF THE GREAT HALL OF THE UNIVERSITY COMMONLY CALLED UNIVERSITY COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Received: On time
Dr NICHOLAS PETER YEUNG Trustee 05 July 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £234.96k £198.01k £111.31k £301.59k £466.01k
Total expenditure £361.27k £346.94k £304.30k £335.61k £329.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 28 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 28 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 16 June 2023 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 06 June 2023 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 27 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 June 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 23 June 2021 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 January 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH JUNE 1988
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING AT AND THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE COLLEGE. (2) THE FUNDING OF FELLOWSHIPS, RESEARCH POSTS AND SCHOLARSHIPS WITHIN OR IN CONNECTION WITH THE COLLEGE. (3) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR STUDY AND RESEARCH (WITH A VIEW TO PUBLICATION) AT OR IN CONNECTION WITH THE COLLEGE AND THE PAYMENT OF THE EXPENSES THEREOF. (4) THE CONSTRUCTION PROVISION RESTORATION IMPROVEMENT REPAIR MAINTENANCE OR REPLACEMENT OF ANY BUILDING USED OR TO BE USED BY THE COLLEGE AND THE FIXTURES FITTINGS FURNISHINGS AND EQUIPMENT FOR USE THEREIN. (5) THE MAKING OF DONATIONS AND OTHER CONTRIBUTIONS TO THE COLLEGE.
Area of benefit
OXFORD
Registration history
  • 12 August 1988 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
UNIVERSITY COLLEGE
HIGH STREET
OXFORD
OX1 4BH
Phone:
01865276674
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available