HOLTON-LE-MOOR MARRIAGE PORTION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO GIVE A SMALL SUM OF MONEY TO ANY GIRL RESIDENT OF HOLTON LE MOOR WHO GETS MARRIED IN ST LUKE'S
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 16 November 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN EDWARD GIBBONS | Chair | 17 March 1997 |
|
|||||
Robert Tubman | Trustee | 09 September 2015 |
|
|||||
AMANDA DRURY | Trustee | 18 March 2011 |
|
|||||
KIM PALMER | Trustee | 18 March 2011 |
|
|||||
REV IAN RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANGELA LAWRENCE | Trustee |
|
||||||
PHILIPPA FLEETWOOD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2 | £2 | £1 | £1 | £5 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 December 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 20 MAY 1976
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR YEARLY INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES AND IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY:- (1)IN MAKING GRANTS IN CASES OF NEED AT CHRISTMAS TIME TO WOMEN WHO HAVE BEEN MARRIED IN THE PARISH CHURCH OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LUKE, HOLTON-LE-MOOR, WITHIN THE PRECEDING YEAR AND WHO HAVE RESIDED OR WHOSE HOME HAS BEEN IN THAT ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH DURING THE YEAR PRECEDING THEIR MARRIAGE. (2)IN AUGMENTING THE INCOME OF THE ABOVE-MENTIONED CHARITY CALLED THE DIXON ALMSHOUSES.
Area of benefit
HOLTON-LE-MOOR
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HALL
GATEHOUSE ROAD
HOLTON-LE-MOOR
MARKET RASEN
LN7 6AG
- Phone:
- 07831615426
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window