PORTLAND GIG ROWING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote the sport of Gig Rowing to anyone who wishes to come and have a go at both social and competitive levels. We offer rowing to adults and juniors (11 - 18) a membership fee is payable plus a small fee per row. Gig Rowing is a great way to not only keep fit but also to meet new friends. It helps people to build on their own individual strengths and become part of a winning team.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 26 May 2011: Standard registration
- PGRC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID WATKINSON | Chair | 17 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Max Gordon | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Coombs | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Bousfield | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Lake | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Francis | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Matthews | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Brayshaw | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
HILARY HASKETT | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maxine McGrath | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.83k | £4.39k | £4.08k | £10.25k | £11.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.34k | £4.53k | £4.00k | £9.95k | £14.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 03 January 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 December 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/2009 AS AMENDED ON 08/02/2010 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 21/04/2011 as amended on 27 Mar 2019 as amended on 27 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE THE PROMOTION OF PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PORTLAND AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE FACILITIES FOR ROWING
Area of benefit
DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Sidon Mews
Portland
Portland
DT5 1FG
- Phone:
- 01305 772523
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window