Financial history ANCHOR EDUCATION LTD

Charity Number: 1138454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.12k £4.05k £3.28k £7.19k £5.84k
Total expenditure £2.52k £3.35k £4.93k £7.99k £4.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A