Financial history MARCH OF THE LIVING (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1138604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £307.57k £206.14k £629.67k £632.56k £854.85k
Total expenditure £251.69k £129.56k £691.06k £656.34k £879.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £482.06k £483.37k £616.29k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £147.61k £149.19k £238.56k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £680.00k £645.59k £869.12k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £11.06k £10.75k £10.21k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0 £4.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0