TENDRING METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of regular public acts of worship open to members of the Church and non members alike The provision of sacred space (a building) for prayer and contemplation The teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and services Supporting other Charities in the UK and overseas financially and with prayer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

48 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 17 February 2011: Previously excepted registration
- 06 January 2025: Funds received from 1187861 TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH, CLACTON
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
48 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev THOMAS JOHN OSBORNE | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
Janet Margerum | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Marion Gourley | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Ann Beeton | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Garry Ray Sysling | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sally Maureen Vincent | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
Janet Elizabeth Cook | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Eirwen Grenfell-Essam | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Jaqueline Kilby | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rodney Barry Lambelle | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Deborah Setterfield | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Harold Edwards | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Tina Bull | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jayne Chapman | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Lee Lay-Flurrie | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Angela Shereni | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Maud Marshall | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Penelope Humphries | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Steven William Peter Sutton | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rosina Fisher | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Barbara Brittain | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Marion Annette Cole | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Mhairi Elizabeth Kimmitt | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Madeleine Claire Whittle | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Tubby | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Ann Woods | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Jane Elizabeth Allison | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Deborah Louise West | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Gillian Ruth Bavister | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
David Frederick Bavister | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Hazel McLaughlin | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Mavis Stephens | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|||||||
Rev TREVOR MICHAEL HAHN | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|||||||
CATHERINE ANNE SCOTT | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Rev JOHN LEWIS HESLOP ALLISON | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Elizabeth Wright | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Denise Patricia Raven | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET MARY QUARTERMAIN | Trustee | 22 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MARIE ELIZABETH WEST | Trustee | 11 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||
BRIAN THOMAS CUTHBERTSON | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||
JANET ELIZABETH TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID ERNEST SHEARMUR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANDREW JOHN MERRIDAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Rev ROGER JOHN PARSONS BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Rev DEREK LANG BSC MA | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ROBERT JAMES TAYLOR MIET | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ANNE CHRISTINE LOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
KATE MARY COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £217.92k | £219.76k | £810.51k | £557.62k | £222.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £308.42k | £246.67k | £223.68k | £478.05k | £300.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £70 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £10.74k | £6.62k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £1.54k | £5.26k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £798.16k | £545.74k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | £5.50k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £394 | £108.91k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | £5.50k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £394 | £108.91k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £219.29k | £363.64k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tendring Methodist Circuit Office
C/O Emmanuel Church
New Pier Street
Walton-on-the- Naze
Essex
CO14 8EB
- Phone:
- 01206 257453
- Website:
-
tendringunited.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window