THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CRAY, ST BARNABAS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular Sunday & weekday public worship and meetings for prayer. Teaching of Christianity and values. Promotion of the mission of the church. Provision of a daily Pre- School for the pre-school-age children(3-5 years) of the parish Financial support for UK and overseas charities and missions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bromley
Governance
- 11 November 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST BARNABAS CHURCH, ST PAULS'S CRAY (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kayleigh Hannah Shaw | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Randolph Attar | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chinyelu Beatrice Nwandu | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Neil Geoffrey Coleman | Trustee | 13 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susan Irene Proctor | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Eric Lander | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Comfort Amilia Harding | Trustee | 21 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Roy Fitzpatrick | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev JANE ELIZABETH RAWLING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE LANDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.38k | £112.25k | £135.07k | £133.33k | £150.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.06k | £118.32k | £114.11k | £129.76k | £122.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Barnabas Church
Rushet Road
ORPINGTON
Kent
BR5 2PU
- Phone:
- 01689821353
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window