EDALE MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Saving lives in wild and remote places
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Lancashire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 27 October 2010: Standard registration
- EMRT AND EDALE MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM (Working name)
- EDALE MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN BUNTING | Chair | 22 March 2018 |
|
|||||||
Simon Beasley | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Smith Donaldson | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|||||||
DAVID STEPHEN TORR | Trustee | 28 July 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Bob Davey | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.01k | £127.03k | £122.06k | £137.59k | £207.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.19k | £78.82k | £91.47k | £144.75k | £96.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 08 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
TO SAVE LIFE AND ALLEVIATE DISTRESS PRIMARILY IN UPLAND AND MOUNTAINOUS AREAS IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTIVES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SHEFFIELD CITY, DERBYSHIRE, STAFFORDSHIRE, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, ROTHERHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Edale Mountain Rescue Team HQ
Hope Cement Works
Hope
Derbyshire
S33 6RP
- Phone:
- 07739628059
- Email:
- secretary@edalemrt.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window