CHURCH @ THE CROSS BIRKENHEAD (METHODIST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday Worship, with junior church, youth music group and youth fellowship. Youth Club 4 evenings per week that serves young people with additional needs, Neighbourhood Centre;Support for community groups and local charities and a base for the Street Pastors also a distribution centre for the local food bank.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wirral
Governance
- 04 May 2011: Standard registration
- CHARING CROSS METHODIST CHURCH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Noel Sharp | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Nichola Lennon | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Conway | Trustee | 15 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Lesley Neill | Trustee | 15 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOAN CORKILL | Trustee | 15 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Sylvia Swift | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rushton | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Annette Lennon | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVID LENNON | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY LESLIE EDWARDS | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
|||||
JUNE CAROLINE BUCKINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBRA DENISE EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
John Oliver Buckingham | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE HITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.44k | £25.47k | £137.27k | £69.22k | £83.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.21k | £33.46k | £126.13k | £78.65k | £46.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £98.92k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20/09/1932 as amended on 19 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church @ The Cross Birkenhead
1 Whitfield Street
BIRKENHEAD
Merseyside
CH42 0LR
- Phone:
- 01516479345
- Website:
-
thecrossbirkenhead.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window