THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARD SHOREDITCH

Charity number: 1139673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parish Church of St Leonard Shoreditch in the London Borough of Hackney

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £379,523
Total expenditure: £368,252

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney
  • Islington
  • Tower Hamlets

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 January 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SHOREDITCH CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacqueline Driver Trustee 15 May 2023
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST HAM
Received: On time
HACKNEY LIGHTHOUSE CIO
Received: On time
Devon Kuziw Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Jess Cliff Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Anna Holton Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Rev Toby Thomas Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Richard Matthews Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
John Parmiter Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Rev Mark Nelson Trustee 12 May 2022
MISS VAUGHAN'S SPITALFIELDS CHARITY
Received: On time
Yvonne Tapper Trustee 12 May 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HACKNEY
Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
Rev Naomi Maxwell Trustee 01 July 2021
HACKNEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HACKNEY
Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
Rev Alexander Gordon Trustee 01 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HACKNEY
Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
HACKNEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
HACKNEY LIGHTHOUSE CIO
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST EDWARD AND ST LUKE LEYTON
Recently registered
HACKNEY FREE AND PAROCHIAL SCHOOLS EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
DEBORAH MARY PRITCHARD Trustee
None on record
PHILIP MICHAEL WHITEHEAD MA MSC Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £377.85k £200.04k £268.45k £287.62k £379.52k
Total expenditure £403.99k £181.34k £331.62k £349.99k £368.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 June 2024 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Shoreditch Church
Shoreditch High Street
LONDON
E1 6JN
Phone:
07989565739