Financial history MARITIME ARCHAEOLOGY SEA TRUST

Charity number: 1140497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £488.00k £423.17k £274.32k £84.04k £129.31k
Total expenditure £442.63k £467.09k £269.97k £162.46k £115.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £428.71k £358.10k £190.56k N/A N/A