SHAPESHIFTER PRODUCTIONS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shapeshifter Productions is a performing arts charity based in Waltham Forest. The object is to advance the arts for the public benefit by the promotion in particular, but not exclusively, of the arts of drama and music. Our activities focus on delivering original, world class productions, reaching out and actively engaging local communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £29,655 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Throughout London
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 May 2011: Standard registration
- SS OR SHAPESHIFTER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JO NOLAN | Chair |
|
||||||
Eamonn Flynn | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Lorraine Cox | Trustee | 06 July 2016 |
|
|||||
Milica Milosevic | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|||||
ALISON LESLEY JONES DIRECTOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK WILLIAM KENDRICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.69k | £128.56k | £92.42k | £134.06k | £91.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.72k | £115.53k | £86.55k | £133.93k | £103.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £8.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.44k | £10.35k | £2.61k | £48.14k | £29.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/04/2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF THE ARTS OF DRAMA AND MUSIC
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shapeshifter Productions
Batten House
The Drive
London
E17 3BX
- Phone:
- 02070971409
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window