ALCOHOL RESEARCH UK

Charity number: 1140287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We work to significantly reduce alcohol harm in the UK by: funding, commissioning and sharing research; working to ensure more and better support and treatment; encouraging better policy and regulation; shifting drinking cultures through our campaigns; and working to change drinking behaviours by providing advice and information.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 February 2011: Standard registration
  • 10 October 2012: Funds received from 284748 ALCOHOL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH FUND
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ALCOHOL CHANGE UK (Working name)
  • ALCOHOL CONCERN (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Urwin Chair 03 October 2022
ONE PUNCH UK UNITED LTD
Received: 5 days late
Jonathan Gerald Spain Trustee 21 October 2024
LAW FOR LIFE: THE FOUNDATION FOR PUBLIC LEGAL EDUCATION
Received: On time
HELPLINES PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
LAWYERS AGAINST POVERTY
Received: On time
DAVID ISHAG SYNAGOGUE - NEVEH SHALOM SEPHARDI COMMUNITY
Received: On time
Emma Greenwood Trustee 08 July 2024
None on record
Herdeep O'Connor Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
Raveena Dhadwal Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
Helen Huong Chang Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
Jeremy Joseph Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
Hannah Dorothea Grummett Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Vivienne Marion Evans OBE Trustee 18 March 2020
None on record
Dr Emmert Roberts Trustee 18 March 2019
None on record
Michael Charles Bellamy Trustee 18 March 2019
THE INSTITUTE OF DEVELOPMENT STUDIES
Received: On time
Dr EMILY FINCH Trustee 01 May 2017
THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF PSYCHIATRISTS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £872.83k £793.22k £1.01m £1.23m £1.42m
Total expenditure £1.39m £1.69m £2.07m £1.83m £2.26m
Income from government contracts £32.77k £32.54k £77.47k £172.34k £452.76k
Income from government grants £201.98k £150.94k £162.50k £150.94k £150.94k
Income - Donations and legacies £76.94k £131.64k £174.55k £188.21k £273.35k
Income - Other trading activities £21.12k £54.16k £61.49k £7.44k £14.09k
Income - Charitable activities £292.61k £252.46k £415.98k £642.90k £778.34k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £482.17k £354.66k £358.35k £388.75k £356.41k
Income - Other £0 £310 £1.28k £364 £0
Income - Legacies £18.00k £0 £0 £25.42k £7.95k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.13m £1.39m £1.28m £1.44m £1.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £261.61k £298.56k £335.15k £390.01k £450.24k
Expenditure - Governance £66.30k £68.00k £56.96k £60.82k £92.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £218.38k £65.45k £112.82k £16.20k
Expenditure - Investment management £70.35k £67.19k £51.20k £22.80k £1.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £451.00k £0 £2.14k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.64m £1.62m £1.13m £1.26m £1.23m
Long-term investments £10.81m £11.47m £11.03m £9.29m £10.01m
Other assets £425.94k £548.67k £819.57k £1.70m £753.97k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £322.24k £471.05k £495.80k £525.47k £384.80k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
27 Swinton Street
London
WC1X 9NW
Phone:
02039078480