Financial history PEOPLE CHARITY

Charity number: 1141280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.35k £33.16k £26.91k £26.22k £14.51k
Total expenditure £28.06k £21.60k £20.96k £27.07k £17.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A