CITIZENS ADVICE SOLIHULL BOROUGH LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but without limitation for the benefit of the community in Solihull and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Solihull
Governance
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ophelia Kainth | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Aman Kapoor | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Sean Rudolph | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Brian Cole | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Rebecca Jayne Gater | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Daniel Bliss | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Marcus Brain | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|||||||
ANN MARGARET HUNTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.15k | £339.51k | £381.18k | £369.82k | £339.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £231.93k | £250.15k | £350.49k | £315.63k | £373.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £84.00k | £70.47k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCORPORATED 09/12/2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN SOLIHULL AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Area of benefit
SOLIHULL AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
176 BOSWORTH DRIVE
BIRMINGHAM
B37 5DZ
- Phone:
- 01217796707
- Email:
- chelmsley@casb.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window