Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST GEORGES CHURCH FREEZYWATER

Charity Number: 1143794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £92.71k £122.71k £109.82k £112.44k £123.05k
Total expenditure £130.43k £130.43k £125.92k £140.32k £132.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.31k £6.92k N/A N/A N/A