Trustees BURSLEM METHODIST MISSION (SWAN BANK)

Charity number: 1141130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

32 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Cameron Sheeran Chair 04 June 2023
None on record
Sylvina Johnson Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Thompson Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Mercy Macheka Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Phillip Dann Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Joseph Hearson Trustee 04 June 2023
None on record
Craig Rome Trustee 04 June 2023
None on record
Mike Mountford Trustee 04 June 2023
None on record
David Potter Trustee 04 June 2023
None on record
Sandra Hearson Trustee 04 June 2023
None on record
Shirley Brooks Trustee 04 June 2023
None on record
Alan Taylor Trustee 04 June 2023
None on record
Ethan Blood Trustee 04 June 2023
None on record
KEITH IAN STUBBS Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Rev Ruth Hazel Jeffries Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Opelo Kgari Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Jonathan Adam Boult Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
Shaun Charles Follett Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Rev William Arthur Wakelin Trustee 31 August 2020
NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT GROUP
Received: On time
Rita Taylor Trustee 23 January 2020
None on record