LIONS BRASS 4 YOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charities activities are to give young people in North Somerset the opportunity to learn, play and perform in a brass band. To enable them to do this they play a wide variety of music and play at many different venues throughout the school year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Somerset
- Somerset
Governance
- 20 September 2011: Standard registration
- 19 December 2023: Funds received from 1178272 NAILSEA LIONS CLUB
- LB4Y (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN MALCOLM UNDERWOOD | Chair | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Nicol | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Mitchell | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
MRS DEBBIE UNDERWOOD BSCCHIRO D.C. MSCCHIRO FRCO FCC | Trustee | 20 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.39k | £29.17k | £9.83k | £12.06k | £15.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.17k | £25.09k | £23.30k | £11.55k | £15.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 08/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 07/09/2012 as amended on 09 Sep 2022 as amended on 06 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
The charity?s objects are: (1) To advance the education of young people (aged up to 21) and the general public in the art of brass band music, in particular within the South West of the UK, by the provision of the necessary facilities, equipment and training and public performances of a range of works; (2) To further such charitable purposes (charitable under English law) as the trustees see fit from time to time.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Fosse Lane
Nailsea
Bristol
BS48 2AR
- Phone:
- 07815733886
- Email:
- DAUWOOD@AOL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window