Governing document Gene People

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED ON 28 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05 MAY 2021 as amended on 05 May 2021 as amended on 30 Apr 2025 as amended on 30 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
3.1 The Objects are: 3.1.1 the relief of persons suffering from genetic disorders; 3.1.2 the advancement of medical research into the causes, cure, prevention or relief of such disorders and the publication of the results of that research; 3.1.3 to raise awareness and advance the education of the public on the subject of genetic disorders; 3.1.4 to promote the efficiency and effectiveness of other genetic disorder charities in order to assist them to achieve their charitable purposes; and 3.1.5 such other purposes as are charitable according to the laws of England and Wales for the benefit of the public. 3.2 Nothing in these Articles shall authorise an application of the property of the Charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with any statutory provision regarding the meaning of the word charitable or the words charitable purposes in force in any part of the United Kingdom.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.