Trustees WOODFORD BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1141385

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Abraham Cherian | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Bethan Mary Davies Kay | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rozier Van Blerk | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Elizabeth Waterfield | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Johannes Christiaan Kriel | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Marianne Escobar | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Michelle McNeil | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Gordon Woolley | Trustee | 04 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LAURA CLARK | Trustee | 02 April 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.