ST ANTONY'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1141293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The College's main activity is the provision of excellent post-graduate education and research opportunities to world-class students and academics from across the globe, focusing on international relations, economics, politics, history, anthropology and interdisciplinary area studies.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 April 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST ANTONY'S COLLEGE OXFORD (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

42 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR ROGER GOODMAN Chair 23 August 2011
OXFORD INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY STUDIES
Received: On time
Prof Kristi Govella Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Janaki Srinivasan Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Dr Michael Odijie Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Dr Gregory Thaler Trustee 16 September 2024
None on record
Dr Federica Genovese Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Dr Jonathan Lusthaus Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Dr Michael Rochlitz Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Dr Amir Lebdioui Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Dr Raihan Ismail Trustee 07 August 2023
None on record
Dr Catherine Briddick Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Dr Zbigniew Wojnowski Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Dr Maryam Alemzadeh Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Dr Neil Ketchley Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Dr Irem Guceri Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Tanya Baldwin Trustee 13 April 2020
HELEN & DOUGLAS HOUSE
Received: On time
Dr Simukai Chigudu Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Dr Timothee Vlandas Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Dr Eric Justin Chaney Trustee 14 January 2018
None on record
Dr Blessing Tendi Trustee 01 November 2017
None on record
Dr Katie Helen Sullivan De Estrada Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Dr Thomas Hale Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
Hugh Whittaker Trustee 07 May 2014
None on record
Dr Timothy Power Trustee 05 December 2013
None on record
PROFESSOR DOMINIC JOHNSON Trustee 14 April 2013
None on record
Dr RAMON SARRO Trustee 20 March 2013
None on record
Professor Paul Betts Trustee 20 March 2013
None on record
Dr ROY ALLISON Trustee 26 March 2012
None on record
Dr LAURENT MIGNON Trustee 26 March 2012
OXFORD CENTRE FOR HEBREW AND JEWISH STUDIES
Received: On time
PROFESSOR LEIGH ANN PAYNE Trustee 11 May 2011
None on record
Dr WALTER TICE ARMBRUST Trustee 11 May 2011
None on record
Dr DAVID JOHNSON Trustee 11 April 2011
None on record
Dr DAVID PRATTEN Trustee 11 April 2011
None on record
Prof MICHAEL WILLIS Trustee 11 April 2011
None on record
Dr SHO KONISHI Trustee 11 April 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR TAKEHIKO KARIYA Trustee 11 April 2011
None on record
Dr PAUL CHAISTY Trustee 11 April 2011
None on record
Professor Faisal Devji Trustee 11 April 2011
VIQUARAN NISA NOON AND FIROZ KHAN NOON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CHARLES WALLACE PAKISTAN TRUST
Received: On time
Prof Eugene Rogan Trustee 11 April 2011
THE AGA KHAN UNIVERSITY (INTERNATIONAL) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Received: On time
Dr DIEGO SANCHEZ-ANCOCHEA Trustee 11 April 2011
None on record
Dr NANDINI GOOPTU Trustee 11 April 2011
None on record
Dr RACHEL MURPHY Trustee 11 April 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £7.62m £8.06m £10.05m £9.05m £11.77m
Total expenditure £8.84m £7.50m £6.92m £8.24m £8.64m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.17m £2.30m £4.50m £2.39m £4.59m
Income - Other trading activities £562.00k £131.00k £3.00k £132.00k £405.00k
Income - Charitable activities £4.03m £3.77m £3.85m £4.20m £4.47m
Income - Endowments £626.00k £547.00k £602.00k £293.00k £172.00k
Income - Investment £870.00k £1.62m £1.52m £1.94m £2.30m
Income - Other £0 £231.00k £179.00k £387.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £1.86m £230.02k £3.15m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.03m £7.15m £6.67m £7.67m £7.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £816.00k £348.00k £256.00k £565.00k £676.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £19.00k £20.00k £24.00k £27.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £12.00k £1.00k £11.00k £195.00k £1.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Own use assets £25.15m £73.67m £59.56m £30.69m £90.00m
Long-term investments £49.74m £3.97m £31.46m £61.41m £110.00k
Other assets £5.07m £7.38m £6.83m £4.94m £2.42m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£1.25m -£754.00k -£719.00k -£1.12m -£746.00k
Total liabilities £4.58m £11.87m £11.95m £8.20m £3.34m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 20 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 20 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 22 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 22 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 28 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 09 June 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 09 June 2021 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 22 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 22 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Antony's College
62 Woodstock Road
OXFORD
OX2 6JF
Phone:
01865284742