Trustees PONSANOOTH HALL MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Charity number: 1142542

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terence Paul Williams | Chair | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anita Jervis | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sally Beckett | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Law | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Dixon | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ann Williams | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Grace Jenkin | Trustee | 26 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Andrew John Ridout | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Maria Manetta | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marie Ridout | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER TREWERN | Trustee | 11 April 2014 |
|
|||||
SUSAN MARY JENKINS | Trustee | 13 April 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.