NEAR NEIGHBOURS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Near Neighbours programme builds social integration by bringing people together in religiously and ethnically diverse communities, creating friendships, building relationships of trust and helping people to transform their neighbourhoods together. Near Neighbours works in locations in England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £415,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Canon Jenny Ramsden | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Catriona Anne Elizabeth Robertson | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Rev Catherine Frances Allison | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Katherine Hodkinson | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rogers Morgan Govender | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jessica Beatrice Foster | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Sudworth | Trustee | 15 August 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.96m | £899.66k | £2.30m | £525.21k | £491.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.95m | £1.00m | £2.25m | £520.37k | £381.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.91m | £850.00k | £2.30m | £500.00k | £415.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.96m | £0 | £2.30m | £525.21k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £899.66k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.95m | £1.00m | £2.25m | £520.37k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £156.38k | £42.70k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.95m | £653.01k | £1.60m | £295.25k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY’S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN AREAS WITHIN THE PROVINCES OF CANTERBURY AND YORK WHICH ARE IN NEED OF SPIRITUAL AND MATERIAL ASSISTANCE BY REASON OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCE WITH A VIEW TO REINFORCING THE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AMONG THE PEOPLE OF THOSE AREAS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Foundry
17 Oval Way
LONDON
SE11 5RR
- Phone:
- 0203 752 5651
- Email:
- hello@cuf.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window