Financial history CHESTER DIOCESAN GUILD OF CHURCH BELL RINGERS

Charity number: 1148441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.31k £7.18k £8.91k £11.35k £16.38k
Total expenditure £25.20k £2.79k £8.11k £2.46k £17.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A