THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST KYNEBURGHA CASTOR WITH UPTON AND STIBBINGTON AND WATER NEWTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England place of worship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,688 from 2 government grant(s)
People

25 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 07 July 2011: Standard registration
- Castor & Ailsworth St Kyneburgha PCC (Working name)
- ST KYNEBURGHA'S PCC, CASTOR (Previous name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST KYNEBURGHA CASTOR WITH ST JOHN THE BAPTIST UPTON (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nadia May Stoney | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Edwards | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Samways | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Squire | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
janet Armitage | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Shilo Varughese | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Loiuse Bradshaw | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julian Keith Burton | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||
David John Walker | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver James Southgate | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Bailey | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA LOUISE MILLEN | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MURRELL | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER FRANCIS THOMPSON | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Ridgeway | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|||||
David Nicholas Edwards | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anne Janet Megan Perkins | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN GRYS | Trustee | 07 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL FITZJOHN | Trustee | 07 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM MANTON BAXTER | Trustee | 07 July 2011 |
|
|||||
ELISABETH ANNE BROWN | Trustee | 07 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS JO MORRIS | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS JAY WINFREY | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
LYN PATRICIA BELL | Trustee | 30 May 2001 |
|
|
||||
ISOBEL CLAIRE HARRIS | Trustee | 19 May 1990 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.79k | £115.30k | £113.87k | £133.09k | £134.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.31k | £136.06k | £150.26k | £131.06k | £141.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.70k | £3.22k | £4.51k | £4.71k | £3.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
EXCEPTED PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BENEFICE OFFICE
THE CEDAR CENTRE
CHURCH WALK
CASTOR
PETERBOROUGH
PE5 7AY
- Phone:
- 07786030936
- Email:
- admin.castor@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window