Trustees THE METHODIST CHURCH, NORTH FYLDE CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1142571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

31 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev William Hunter Chair 01 September 2020
THE LANCASHIRE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Charity reporting is overdue by 319 days
Susan Crackles Trustee 24 March 2025
None on record
Garry Melvyn Whittle Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Tina Whalley Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Ralph Whittingham Trustee 18 March 2025
THE METHODIST CHURCH, POULTON LE FYLDE
Received: On time
Keith Bleazard Trustee 18 March 2025
THE METHODIST CHURCH, POULTON LE FYLDE
Received: On time
Janice Whittle Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Annette Mary Hartley Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Peter Wilson Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
PATRICIA ANN GREGORY Trustee 01 March 2022
THORNTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Sharon Ann Webb Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Jessica Anne Basquill Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Rev Sarah Lamb Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Rev Katherine Anne Leonowicz Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Stephen Paul Williams Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Mary Alison Green Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Margaret Grace Murphy Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
JANET MORDIKE MA Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Geraldine Bernice Smith Trustee 01 September 2016
THORNTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
BRIAN ANTHONY ROBBINS BA MED Trustee 01 July 2013
THORNTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time