ORION SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Orion Orchestra is a London-based symphony orchestra for exceptionally talented young musicians soon to leave music college. Performing within the city's most prestigious venues, it aims to encompass the full range of orchestral styles and disciplines its members will encounter in their later professional lives, from operatic and orchestral music to contemporary and fusion styles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 December 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTIAN GROBEL | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|||||||||||
Charles Kirby | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Peter Sheppard | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
IAN MCLEAN ADAMS | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Christopher John Colosimo | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
TOBY PURSER | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Janet Cassidy | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Denis Cassidy | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Karen Phillipps | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
MARGARET POLLOCK | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Andrew Hollingsworth | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.07k | £22.82k | £81.78k | £103.28k | £142.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.56k | £8.28k | £69.39k | £114.35k | £113.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 March 2025 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 March 2025 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 March 2025 | 405 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 March 2025 | 405 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/03/2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP, MAINTAIN AND ENCOURAGE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ARTS IN GENERAL INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ART OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, BY SUCH MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: I) THE PROVISION OF EXCEPTIONAL DEVELOPMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE BEST YOUNG TALENT AND RECENT GRADUATES FROM THE UK'S MUSIC COLLEGES AND CONSERVATOIRES BY WORKING UNDER PROFESSIONAL REHEARSAL CONDITIONS AND TO THE HIGHEST PUBLIC PERFORMANCE STANDARDS, WHICH CAN INTRODUCE AND ENGAGE NEW AND EMERGING AUDIENCES. II) THE REDISCOVERY; PROMOTION AND PERFORMANCE OF NEGLECTED MASTERPEICES, ESPECIALLY THOSE OF BRITISH COMPOSERS, AND THE COMMISSIONING OF NEW MUSICAL WORKS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 St Giles Road
Camberwell
London
SE5 7RL
- Phone:
- 07928703131
- Email:
- admin@orionorchestra.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window